EP0492691 - Two-step method for recovering dispersed noble metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Robert J. 130 Adams Avenue Saugus, Massachusetts 01906 / US | 02 /
Foller, Peter C. 20000 Commonwealth Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02135 / US | 03 /
Giallombardo, James 25 Hull Street Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US | [1992/27] | Application number, filing date | 91203226.5 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900632160 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: US 632160 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0492691 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/06 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
C01G55/005 (EP,US);
C22B11/026 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [1992/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung feinverteilter Edelmetalle durch eine zweistufige Behandlung | [1992/27] | English: | Two-step method for recovering dispersed noble metals | [1992/27] | French: | Procédé de récupération de métaux précieux finement dispersés par un traitement à deux étages | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 02.02.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3021209 (MURRAY MAURICE J, et al); | [A]DE1051009 ; | [A]DE671863 (WALTHER KANGRO DR); | [AD]US2828200 (NIXON WILLIAM G); | [AD]US3951648 (STERN ROBERT, et al); | [AD]US4077800 (PEKA IVO, et al); | [Y]JPS54107801 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3no. 128 (C-62)(83) 24 October 1979 & JP-A-54 107 801 ( CHIYODA KAKO KENSETSU ) 24 August 1979 | [A] - GMELIN,SYSTEM 64,VOL. B 1 'Rhodium' 1982 , SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN-NEW YORK |