EP0491441 - Fungicidal isoquinoline derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissinger, Hans-Joachim Leidsevaart 274 NL-2014 HH Haarlem / NL | 02 /
Schröder, Ludwig Frankenstrasse 7 W-6507 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
Albert, Guido Volxheimerstrasse 4 W-6551 Hackenheim / DE | 04 /
Pees, Klaus-Jürgen Soonwald Strasse 9 W-6500 Mainz / DE | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91203316.4 | 16.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | EP19900124372 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: EP 90124372 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491441 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/16, C07D217/22, A01N43/42, C07D217/14, C07D491/04, // (C07D491/04, 317:00, 221:00) | [1992/26] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP);
C07D217/16 (EP,KR);
A01N43/42 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
C07D217/02 (EP);
C07D217/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1992/26] | Title | German: | Fungizide Isochinolinderivate | [1992/26] | English: | Fungicidal isoquinoline derivatives | [1992/26] | French: | Dérivés d'isoquinolinefongicides | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 07.08.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0251361 [ ] (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]); | DE739866 [ ] (TEMMLER WERKE); | US3474104 [ ] (OTT HANS); | FR2238489 [ ] (SEARLE & CO [US]); | GB1176804 [ ] (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]); | GB1178434 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | GB642286 [ ] (BOOTS PURE DRUG CO LTD, et al); | US3823148 [ ] (JANSEN A, et al); | US4321382 [ ] (LUNDBERG JR CHARLES A, et al); | EP0013411 [ ] (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD [JP]); | GB1030022 [ ] (ORGAMOL SA); | GB374627 [ ] (GEORGE BELOE ELLIS); | FR760825 [ ] (ASTA AG CHEM FAB); | GB645139 [ ] (SERVITA GYOGYSZERYAR ES VEGYIP, et al); | EP0121753 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS I, 1985, pages 275-281, Letchworth, GB; J.M. BARKER et al.: "Dehalogenation of 1-halogenothienyl-di-and -tetra-hydroisoquinolines by sodium methoxide in dimethyl sulphoxide" | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS I, 1976, pages 2193-2196, Letchworth, GB; A.K. BOSE et al.: "Studies on lactams. Part 45. Some carbocyclic analogues of cephalosporin" | [X] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 26, no. 48, 1985, pages 5975-5978, Oxford, GB; C.S. HILGER et al.: "Synthesis of necatorone" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 70, no. 7, 17th February 1969, page 306, abstract no. 28800e, Columbus, Ohio, US; B. BHATTACHARYA: "Isoquinolines derivatives. XVIII. Formation of 1-alkyl-(or alkaryl or aryl)-3-methyl-7-(or 5)-chloro isoquinolines", & INDIAN J. CHEM., vol. 6, no. 7, 1968, pages 341-345 |