EP0440317 - Method and apparatus for testing ferromagnetic work pieces by ultrasonic waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graff, Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. Viehauser Berg 83 W-4300 Essen 16 / DE | 02 /
Wächter, Michael, Dr.rer.nat. Am Kockshof 23 W-4030 Ratingen 8 / DE | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Presting, Hans-Joachim, et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1991/32] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250011.3 | 22.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | DE19904003215 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4003215 | DE19914101942 | 21.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101942 | [1991/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440317 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440317 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
G01N29/22 (EP);
G01N29/2412 (EP);
G01N2291/0422 (EP);
G01N2291/0423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1991/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Prüfeinrichtungen zum Prüfen ferromagnetischer Werkstücke mittels Ultraschallwellen | [1991/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing ferromagnetic work pieces by ultrasonic waves | [1991/32] | French: | Procédé et appareils pour examiner des pièces à usiner ferromagnétiques par ondes ultrasonores | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU466930 [ ]; | DE3017389 [ ]; | US4295214 [ ] (THOMPSON ROBERT B); | US4380931 [ ] (FROST HAROLD M, et al); | US3583213 [ ] (HOUCK JAMES R, et al); | US4395913 [ ] (PETERSON WILLIAM E) | [ ] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated, Parts I-III Complete, Woche X 15, 19. Mai 1976, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, M 21; & SU,A,466930 (NIKOGORENKO ZHG)., & SU466930 A 00000000 |