EP0442590 - Device for piling separately fed items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klüssendorf Aktiengesellschaft Zitadellenweg 20 D-F D-13599 Berlin / DE | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wingerter, Franz Kolonie Abendroth, Parzelle 7 W-1000 Berlin 42 / DE | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250027.9 | 31.01.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904005063 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005063 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442590 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442590 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/02, B65H29/26 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
B65H29/40 (EP);
B65H31/06 (EP);
B65H31/14 (EP);
B65H2404/6591 (EP);
B65H2701/1912 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/34] | B65H31/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stapeln einzeln zugeführter Gegenstände | [1991/34] | English: | Device for piling separately fed items | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif pour empiler des objets alimenté individuelle | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/09] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4844439 ; | [Y]DE2913077 ; | [A]EP0061631 ; | [A]US3767189 ; | [A]GB1429698 |