EP0447014 - Process for the preparation of intermediates used in the synthesis of progesterone antagonists (synthesis of onapristone) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottow, Eckard, Dr. Moltkestrasse 48 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 02 /
Neef, Günter, Dr. Markgraf Albrecht-Strasse 4 W-1000 Berlin 31 / DE | 03 /
Rohde, Ralph, Dr. Schwatlostrasse 14 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | [1995/44] |
Former [1991/38] | 01 /
Ottow, Eckard, Dr. Moltkestrasse 48 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | ||
02 /
Neef, Günter, Dr. Markgraf-Albrecht-Strasse 4 W-1000 Berlin 31 / DE | |||
03 /
Rohde, Ralph, Dr. Schwatlostrasse 14 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250077.4 | 15.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904008584 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008584 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447014 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447014 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447014 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, C07J43/00, C07J21/00, // A61K31/56 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
C07J41/0083 (EP);
C07J21/006 (EP);
C07J43/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zwischenprodukten für die Antigestagensynthese (Onapristonsynthese) | [1991/38] | English: | Process for the preparation of intermediates used in the synthesis of progesterone antagonists (synthesis of onapristone) | [1991/38] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des intermédiares utilisés dans la synthèse des composés avec activité anti-progesterone (synthèse d'onapristone) | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.1995 | DK | 02.11.1995 | ES | 02.11.1995 | FR | 02.11.1995 | GB | 02.11.1995 | GR | 02.11.1995 | IT | 02.11.1995 | NL | 02.11.1995 | SE | 02.02.1996 | AT | 15.03.1996 | CH | 31.03.1996 | LI | 31.03.1996 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
ES | 02.11.1995 | ||
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
NL | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
ES | 02.11.1995 | ||
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
GR | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
IT | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
DK | 02.11.1995 | ||
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
AT | 15.03.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
GB | 02.11.1995 | ||
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/36] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
FR | 29.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 02.11.1995 | |
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 02.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8303099 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [A]EP0097572 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [A]EP0110434 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [AD]EP0129499 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [A]EP0245170 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [A]EP0305242 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [A]EP0308345 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) |