EP0449399 - Polymerizable dental composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar AG Postfach, Bendererstrasse 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states IVOCLAR AG Postfach, Bendererstrasse 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Floraweg 3 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | 02 /
Salz, Ulrich, Dr. Rosenweg 2 W-8995 Weissenberg / DE | 03 /
Grabher, Kurt Drewesstrasse 6 A-6800 Feldkirch / AT | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250085.7 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | DE19904009602 | 26.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4009602 | [1991/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0449399 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0449399 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449399 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/02, C08K3/40 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
C08K3/40 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Polymerisierbare Dentalmasse | [1991/40] | English: | Polymerizable dental composition | [1991/40] | French: | Composition dentaire polymérisable | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2454101 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP); | [A]DE2736891 (PENNWALT CORP); | [A]EP0091990 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]) | Examination | - Holleman-Wiberg 81-90 Auflage, 1976, S. 568 ff. |