EP0487173 - Control device for fluids, especially for compressed air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekler, Thomas Zehnerstrasse 14 W-3153 Lahstedt 3 / DE | 02 /
Brausfeld, Walter Rosenweg 5 W-3000 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Möller, Rudolf Külweg 15c W-3007 Gehrden 1 / DE | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Presting, Hans-Joachim, et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1992/22] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250285.3 | 15.10.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | DE19904037353 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4037353 | [1992/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487173 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/00 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
F15B13/0832 (EP,US);
F15B13/0817 (EP,US);
F15B13/0821 (EP,US);
F15B13/0857 (EP,US);
F15B13/0875 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5109 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87885 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für fluidische Medien, insbesondere für Druckluft | [1992/22] | English: | Control device for fluids, especially for compressed air | [1992/22] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour fluides, en particulier pour air sous pression | [1992/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/22] | 15.01.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2504610 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2522085 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [A]DE3218006 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE8709604U ; | [X]FR2645602 (FESTO KG [DE]) |