EP0444777 - Needled suture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deknatel Technology Corporation Suite 1704, Bank of Delaware Building, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states Deknatel Technology Corporation Suite 1704, Bank of Delaware Building, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, Delaware / US | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states Pfizer Hospital Products Group, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shave, William H. 158 Harbor South Amityville, New York 11701 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | ||
Former [1991/36] | Bradbrook, Geoffrey William PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent, CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300551.8 | 24.01.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900474594 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 474594 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444777 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444777 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B17/06004 (EP,US);
A61B17/06195 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Nahtfaden mit Nadel | [1991/36] | English: | Needled suture | [1991/36] | French: | Fil de suture avec aiguille | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | BE | 22.05.1996 | CH | 22.05.1996 | DK | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | IT | 22.05.1996 | LI | 22.05.1996 | NL | 22.05.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | GB | 24.01.1997 | LU | 31.01.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
NL | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
GB | 24.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
BE | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1613206 (SESSIONS SOUTTAR HENRY); | [A]GB389826 (SAMUEL JAMES EVERETT); | [A]US2240330 (FLAGG ANDREW B, et al); | [A]US2591063 (HARRY GOLDBERG); | [A]US2802468 (JAMES EVERETT SAMUEL); | [A]US2928395 (STACY FORBES DONALD HAYWORTH, et al); | [A]US3311110 (SOL SINGERMAN, et al); | [A]US3394704 (DERY EDMUND E); | [A]FR2184004 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [Y]FR2268534 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]); | [X]US3926194 (GREENBERG JONATHAN FRED, et al); | [X]US3963031 (HUNTER ALASTAIR W); | [X]US3981307 (BORYSKO EMIL); | [Y]CH597835 (SUTRAMED SARL); | [X]FR2432861 (SYNTHELABO); | [A]DE3223153 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG); | [A]US4470415 (WOZNIAK JOHN J [US]); | [E]EP0420605 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) |