EP0440416 - Crystalline copolymers of p-dioxanone and epsilon-caprolactone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bezwada, Rao S. 1 Nevius Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | 02 /
Shalaby, Shalaby W. 238A Longview Road Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | 03 /
Erneta, Mo 8 Princeton Place Princeton JCT., NJ 08550 / US | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300657.3 | 29.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | US19900472134 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: US 472134 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440416 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440416 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440416 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08G63/06, A61L17/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C08G63/664 (EP,US);
A61L17/105 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
C08G63/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, A61L31/148, A61B17/12, A61B17/08, A61F2/30767, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/32] | Title | German: | Kristalline Copolymere von p-Dioxanon und epsilon-Caprolacton | [1991/32] | English: | Crystalline copolymers of p-dioxanone and epsilon-caprolactone | [1991/32] | French: | Copolymères cristallins de la p-dioxanone et de l'epsilon-caprolactone | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1928103 (GAF CORP); | [XE]EP0415783 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [A]US4643191 (BEZWADA RAO S [US], et al); | [A]US4788979 (JARRETT PETER K [US], et al); | [AD]US4052988 (DODDI NAMASSIVAYA, et al) |