EP0442639 - Socket-type electrical contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinoshita, Yoshiji Tsurumaki Flat 104, 423-13 Kasakubo Isehara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Goodman, Joseph Ray 6-44-22 Shimouma Setagaya-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300873.6 | 04.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | JP19900031470 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3147090 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442639 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442639 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/187 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP);
H01R13/111 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Buchsenartiger elektrischer Kontakt | [1991/34] | English: | Socket-type electrical contact | [1991/34] | French: | Contact électrique du type à douille | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2065993 ; | [X]US4723923 |