EP0443741 - Formulating device for cosmetically functional cosmetic products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revlon Consumer Products Corporation 625 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [1992/39] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states REVLON, INC. 625 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Gustave J. 5 Garden Street Great Neck, New York 11021 / US | 02 /
Pano, Jose Fajarnes Ronda General Mitre 148 E-08022 Barcelona / ES | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [1991/35] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300901.5 | 04.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | US19900483366 | 22.02.1990 Original published format: US 483366 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443741 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443741 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A45D44/00, A45D7/04, B01F15/04, A61K7/09 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
A45D44/00 (EP,US);
A45D44/005 (EP,US);
B01F33/84 (EP,US);
B01F33/8442 (EP,US);
B44D3/003 (EP,US);
G07F13/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Zusammenstellen (Mischen) kosmetisch wirkender Produkte | [1991/35] | English: | Formulating device for cosmetically functional cosmetic products | [1991/35] | French: | Dispositif pour établir la composition de produits à fonction cosmétique | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4294293 (LORENZ HERIBERT, et al); | [A]US4403866 (FALCOFF ALLAN F [US], et al); | [A]EP0165098 (COFIDEP [FR]); | [A]WO9014029 (PERPETUUM AG [CH]) |