EP0442657 - Stent introducer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Carol A. 78 Rea Street Lowell, Massachusetts 01852 / US | 02 /
Chiev, Kim I. 10 Billings Street Lowell, Massachusetts / US | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300971.8 | 06.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | US19900480148 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: US 480148 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442657 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442657 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61M29/04 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9583 (EP,US);
A61M25/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Einführungsvorrichtung für ein Erweiterungsgerät | [1991/34] | English: | Stent introducer system | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif d'introduction d'un dilatateur | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 01.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.1991 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.03.1991 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.01.1991 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.01.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.01.1991 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.03.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | 19.01.1991 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4787899 [ ] (LAZARUS HARRISON M [US]); | WO9005554 [ ] (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]); | EP0335341 [ ]; | US4878906 [ ] (LINDEMANN PEER [US], et al) |