EP0441643 - Inhalation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pesenti, Yvan 8, rue Thiers 38000 Grenoble / FR | For all designated states Quenderff, Jean-Philippe 40, Chemin de la Revirée 38240 Meylan / FR | For all designated states Quenderff, Solange 40 Chemin de la Revirée 38240 Meylan / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states Pesenti, Yvan 8, rue Thiers F-38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
For all designated states Quenderff, Jean-Philippe 40, Chemin de la Revirée F-38240 Meylan / FR | |||
For all designated states Quenderff, Solange 40 Chemin de la Revirée F-38240 Meylan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesenti, Yvan 8 rue Thiers F-3800 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Quenderff, Jean-Philippe 40 Chemin de la Revirée F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1991/33] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301035.1 | 08.02.1991 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | FR19900001928 | 09.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001928 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0441643 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441643 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
A61M15/0091 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0025 (EP,US);
A61M15/0093 (EP,US);
A61M15/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GR, LU, NL, SE [1991/33] | Title | German: | Inhalationsgerät | [1991/33] | English: | Inhalation device | [1991/33] | French: | Appareil d'inhalation | [1991/33] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH511063 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]); | [A]US3789843 (ARMSTRONG J, et al); | [A]EP0045419 (FISONS PLC [GB]) |