EP0449413 - Polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1991/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarkar, Manish 42 Pierson Road Windsor, Berkshire SL4 5RF / GB | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Walter Paul, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Johnston, Walter Paul, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | ||
Former [1991/40] | Johnston, Walter Paul Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301297.7 | 19.02.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | GB19900006558 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9006558 | GB19900006559 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9006559 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449413 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449413 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/38, C08F8/42, C08F220/00 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
C08F8/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Polymere | [1991/40] | English: | Polymers | [1991/40] | French: | Polymères | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.1995 | DK | 20.12.1995 | GR | 20.12.1995 | LU | 29.02.1996 | SE | 20.03.1996 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
SE | 20.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 20.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58191703 ; | [A]DE2944092 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [A]DE2945549 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0031305 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]US4429099 (KENNEDY JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]WO8600626 (DU PONT [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 22, May 1984, page 38, abstract no. 175857v, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 191 703 (NITTO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO.) 09-11-1983 (Cat. A), & JP58191703 A 00000000 |