EP0445945 - Touch probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMurtry, David Roberts 20 Tabernacle Road Wotton-Under-Edge, Glos. GL12 7EF / GB | [1994/37] |
Former [1991/37] | 01 /
McMurtry, David Roberts 20 Tabernacle Road Wotton-Under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 / GB | Representative(s) | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301477.5 | 25.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | GB19900004117 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: GB 9004117 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445945 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445945 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/00 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
G01B11/007 (EP,US);
G01B5/012 (EP,US);
G01B7/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | Mess-Fühlerprobe | [1991/37] | English: | Touch probe | [1991/37] | French: | Sonde de mesure à contact | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93200497.1 / EP0551164 | EP93200498.9 / EP0551165 | EP94200168.6 / EP0598709 | EP95100348.2 / EP0654651 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.09.1994 | SE | 14.12.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/34] | SE | 14.12.1994 | |
FR | 10.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0110192 (TRAUB GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE3715698 (STIEFELMAYER KG C [DE]); | [X]FR2375580 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) |