EP0457419 - Method of producing an aromatic polythiazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hattori, Tatsuya 37-11 Asahigaoka 2-chome, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Akita, Hiroshi 13-41 Sakaecho 2-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Imai, Yoshio 9-2-303 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kakimoto, Mosaaki 61-9-3-504 Ikebukuro, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301564.0 | 26.02.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | JP19900125154 | 15.05.1990 Original published format: JP 12515490 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457419 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457419 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457419 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/32, C08G73/06 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
C08G75/32 (EP,US);
C08G73/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von aromatischem Polythiazol | [1991/47] | English: | Method of producing an aromatic polythiazole | [1991/47] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polythiazole aromatique | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0346094 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0346017 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRYAND PHYSICS. vol. 191, no. 9, 19 February 1990, BASEL CH KRICHELDORF ET AL.: 'New polymer syntheses.Soluble and meltable poly(benzobisthiazole)s derived from substituted terephthalic acids' | Examination | - MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY & PHYSICS, vol. 191, no. 9, 19 February 1990, Basel (CH); KRICHELDORF et al., 2017-2026 |