|
04.09.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
08.08.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1992 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |