EP0447132 - Reflection-type photomask and reflection-type photolithography method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa Kenji 3-9-5, Takamoridai Isehara-shi, Kanagawa, 259-11 / JP | 02 /
Kawashima, Kenichi 1-28-11, Kaminagaya, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 233 / JP | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301925.3 | 07.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | JP19900067601 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6760190 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447132 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447132 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
G03F1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/38] | Title | German: | Reflexionsphotomaske und photolithographisches Verfahren vom Reflexionstyp | [1991/38] | English: | Reflection-type photomask and reflection-type photolithography method | [1991/38] | French: | Photomasque du type à réflexion et méthode photolithographique du type à réflexion | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 06.10.1995 | GB | 07.03.1996 | [1997/17] |
Former [1996/14] | DE | 06.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0279670 (CANON KK [JP]); | [AD]EP0395425 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0401795 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |