EP0467498 - Optical disk player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusano, Satoshi, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorazawa-City, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Toshio, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorazawa-City, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Tawaragi, Yuji, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorazawa-City, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Obitsu, Noriko, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorazawa-City, Saitama / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301940.2 | 08.03.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900191451 | 19.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19145190 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467498 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467498 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467498 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
G11B7/0956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/04] | Title | German: | Optischer Plattenspieler | [1992/04] | English: | Optical disk player | [1992/04] | French: | Lecteur de disque optique | [1996/19] |
Former [1992/04] | Tourne-disque optique | Examination procedure | 26.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0313818 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0357323 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0138277 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | Examination | US4497048 | JPH0279228 |