EP0450782 - Fiberoptic interferometric sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipson, David 1938 Brewster Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46260 / US | 02 /
Loebel, Nicolas Gaston 1237 North East 148th Street, Apartment 6 Seattle, Washington 98155 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302225.7 | 15.03.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900495721 | 19.03.1990 Original published format: US 495721 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450782 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450782 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01N21/43, G01N21/77, G01N21/00, G02B6/00 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/41 (EP,US);
G02B6/26 (KR);
G01D5/266 (EP,US);
G01D5/268 (EP,US);
G01N21/431 (EP,US);
G01N2021/432 (EP,US);
G01N21/45 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | G01N21/00, G02B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Interferometrischer Sensor mit optischen Fasern | [1991/41] | English: | Fiberoptic interferometric sensor | [1991/41] | French: | Opteur interférométrique à fibres optiques | [1991/41] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/23: Teilanmeldung 96200756.3 eingereicht am 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Divisional application 96200756.3 filed on 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Demande divisionnaire 96200756.3 déposée le 19/03/96 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 04.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP96200756.3 / EP0722081 | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0185582 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP0203682 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [AD]US4697876 (DYOTT RICHARD B [US]); | [A]WO8907756 (LUKOSZ WALTER [CH]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 18, no. 12, 1985, BRISTOL, GREAT-BRITAIN; pages 981 - 1001; D. A. JACKSON: 'Monomode optical fibre interferometers for precision measurement' |