EP0453093 - Method of memory management using a tree structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/43] | Method of memory management | ||
[1997/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cline, Robert C. 2037 NW Lance Way Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Garfinkel, Daniel 633 E Stuart Street Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302278.6 | 18.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900496482 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: US 496482 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453093 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453093 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453093 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G06F12/0207 (EP,US);
G06F12/023 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99956 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/43] | Title | German: | Speicherverwaltungsverfahren mit Hilfe einer Baumstruktur | [1997/31] | English: | Method of memory management using a tree structure | [1997/31] | French: | Procédé de gestion de mémoire à l'aide d'une structure en arbre | [1997/31] |
Former [1991/43] | Speicherverwaltungsverfahren | ||
Former [1991/43] | Method of memory management | ||
Former [1991/43] | Procédé de gestion de mémoire | Examination procedure | 04.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.07.1997 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0187240 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |