EP0453097 - Zusammensetzung enthaltend zumindest zwei verschiedene Antikörper oder deren Fragmente [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/43] | Delivery of agents | ||
[1995/49] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [1999/38] |
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1991/43] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beggs, Thomas Stewart 151 Needwood Road Elms Farm, Bedford MK 41 0DN / GB | 02 /
Davis, Paul James The Hawthorns, Pavenham Road Felmersham, Bedford MK 43 7EX / GB | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1991/43] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302404.8 | 20.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | GB19900006327 | 21.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9006327 | GB19900021671 | 05.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9021671 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453097 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453097 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453097 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K7/28 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61K47/6815 (EP);
A61K47/6885 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Composition comprising at least two different antibodies or fragments thereof | [1995/49] | English: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend zumindest zwei verschiedene Antikörper oder deren Fragmente | [1995/49] | French: | Composition comprenant au moins deux anticorps differents ou leurs fragments | [1995/49] |
Former [1991/43] | Verabreichung von Mitteln | ||
Former [1991/43] | Delivery of agents | ||
Former [1991/43] | Délivrance d'agents | Examination procedure | 08.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
23.01.2005
INADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE E.T.C. Temselaan, 100 B-1820 Strombeck-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier, et al, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
23.01.2005
INADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE E.T.C. Temselaan, 100 B-1820 Strombeck-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier, et al, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [1996/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
PROCTER & GAMBLE E.T.C. Temselaan, 100 B-1820 Strombeck-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier, et al, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 04.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01 | 23.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.1995 | BE | 06.12.1995 | DK | 06.12.1995 | GR | 06.12.1995 | ES | 21.03.2001 | SE | 21.03.2001 | CH | 31.03.2001 | LI | 31.03.2001 | DE | 01.01.2002 | NL | 01.10.2002 | FR | 27.11.2003 | GB | 20.03.2004 | IT | 20.03.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2005/45] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
ES | 21.03.2001 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
CH | 31.03.2001 | ||
LI | 31.03.2001 | ||
DE | 01.01.2002 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
FR | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 20.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/37] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
ES | 21.03.2001 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
DE | 01.01.2002 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
FR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
DE | 01.01.2002 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
ES | 16.05.2003 | ||
FR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
DE | 01.01.2002 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
ES | 16.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
DE | 01.01.2002 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
NL | 01.10.2002 | ||
Former [2002/05] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 21.03.2001 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
GR | 06.12.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DK | 06.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 06.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD249977 ; | [Y]FR2187294 (ROYAL COLLEGE SURGEONS ENGLAND [GB]); | [A]WO8801178 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [X]EP0315364 (BIOVENTURES INC [US]); | [X]WO8911866 (RAMA BIO LINK AB [SE]); | [XP]EP0361908 (IDEON CORP [US]); | [XP]WO9100112 (BRUNSWICK CORP [US]) | [A] - STN FILE SERVER, FILE MEDLINE, AN=81192354, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; R.B. JOHNSON, Jr. et al.: "Comparison of glucose oxidase and peroxidase as labels for antibody in enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay" | [X] - STN FILE SERVER, FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 17, abstract no. 145834w, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. PENE et al.: "In vitro cytolysis of myeloma tumor cells with glucose oxidase and lactoperoxidase antibody conjugates", "BIOCHEM. INT., 13(2), 233-43" | [X] - FILE WPIL, AN=88-043338, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & DD-A-249 977 (MEDIZIN AKAD. MAGDEB) 23-09-1987, & DD249977 A 00000000 | Examination | - STN FILE SERVER, FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 17, abstract no. 145834w, Columbus, OH (US); J. PENE et al., no. 145834w |