EP0454305 - Method for manufacture of triethylenediamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN CORPORATION 1975 Eagle Gate Tower Salt Lake City, Utah 84111-1053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Huntsman Corporation 1975 Eagle Gate Tower Salt Lake City, Utah 84111-1053 / US | ||
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states TEXACO CHEMICAL COMPANY 3040 Post Oak Boulevard Houston, Texas 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmerman, Robert Le Roy 5202 Cordova Austin, Texas 78759 / US | 02 /
Knifton, John Frederick 10900 Catskill Trail Austin, Texas 78750 / US | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302692.8 | 27.03.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | US19900515003 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: US 515003 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454305 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454305 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, // B01J27/188 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Triethylendiamin | [1991/44] | English: | Method for manufacture of triethylenediamine | [1991/44] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de triéthylène-diamine | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | JP75117797 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, no. 25, June 21, 1976 Columbus, Ohio, USA OHHASHI Y. et al. "Triethylenediamine" page 583, column 1, abstract-no. 180 284m & JP-A-75-117 797, & JP75117797 A 00000000 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 7, February 14, 1977 Columbus, Ohio, USA GUSEVA E.A. et al. "1,4-Diazabicyclo(2.2.2.)-octane" page 541, column 1,abstract-no. 43 742m & SU-525 681 |