EP0455343 - Liquid developers having curable liquid vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morrison, Ian D. 13 Lincolnshire Road Webster, New York, 14580 / US | 02 /
Hsieh, Bing R. 196 County Manor Way, Apartment 10 Webster, New York, 14580 / US | 03 /
Taylor, Jerry H. 448 Bayside Drive Webster, New York, 14580 / US | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1991/45] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302757.9 | 28.03.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | US19900501585 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: US 501585 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455343 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455343 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/12, G03G9/125, G03G9/13, G03G17/04 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
G03G9/12 (EP);
G03G17/04 (EP);
G03G9/125 (EP);
G03G9/131 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/45] | Title | German: | Flüssigentwickler mit härtbaren flüssigen Trägermaterialien | [1991/45] | English: | Liquid developers having curable liquid vehicles | [1991/45] | French: | Révélateur liquide comportant des matériaux porteurs liquides durcissables | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP61156261 ; | [XD]JP63155055 ; | [XD]JP6218575 ; | [XD]JP62115171 ; | [A]JP2049088 ; | [X]US4473626 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 361 (P-523)[2418], 4th December 1986; & JP-A-61 156 261 (RICOH CO.) 15-07-1986, & JP61156261 A 00000000 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 417 (P-782)[3264], 7th November 1988; & JP-A-63 155 055 (RICOH CO.) 28-06-1988, & JP63155055 A 00000000 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11 no. 194 (P-588)[2641], 23rd June 1987; & JP-A-62 18 575 (RICOH CO.) 27-01-1987, & JP6218575 A 00000000 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 331 (P-630)[2778], 29th October 1987; & JP-A-62 115 171 (RICOH CO.) 26-05-1987, & JP62115171 A 00000000 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ADVANCES IN NON-IMPACT PRINTING TECHNOLOGIES, San Francisco, CA, 24th - 28th August 1986, pages 100-112; J.M. CROWLEY et al.: "Image development by electrostatic lithography" | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 90-096259 [13], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 215 (C-716)[4158], 8th May 1990; & JP-A-2 049 088 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 19-02-1990, & JP2049088 A 00000000 |