EP0452009 - Water soluble solder flux and paste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frazier, Janice Dianne 20508 Henwood Road San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Robert Lloyd 981 Shadow Brook Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Reich, Richard Alan 111 Buckskin Court Georgetown, TX 78628 / US | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302799.1 | 28.03.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | US19900508740 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: US 508740 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0452009 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0452009 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/36, B23K36/363 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
B23K35/3612 (EP,US);
B23K35/36 (EP,US);
B23K35/3615 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/42] | B23K35/363, B23K35/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/42] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliches Weichlötflussmittel und Paste | [1991/42] | English: | Water soluble solder flux and paste | [1991/42] | French: | Flux pour soudure tendre soluble dans l'eau et pâte | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 07.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/11] | 07.11.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE841097 (KOEHLER FRITZ); | [AD]FR2168072 (LAKE CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [AD]US4153482 (STAYNER ROBERT A, et al) |