EP0453150 - Portable trade recording and submission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMODITY EXCHANGE, INC. Four World Trade Center New York, New York 10048 / US | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markowitz, Arthur D. 50 Dorotockey Drive Harrington Park, New Jersey 07640 / US | 02 /
Sabo, John J. 16 Montain Road Wilton, Connecticut 06897 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303078.9 | 08.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900511053 | 19.04.1990 Original published format: US 511053 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453150 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453150 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/24 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/43] | Title | German: | Tragbares Handelssystem zum Registrieren und Vorlegen | [1991/43] | English: | Portable trade recording and submission system | [1991/43] | French: | Système portable pour l'enregistrement et la soumission du négoce | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 01.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/18] | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4903201 (WAGNER SUSAN W [US]); | [E]US5038284 (KRAMER ROBERT M [US]) | [X] - WALL STREET COMPUTER REVIEW vol. 5, no. 6, March 1988, US pages 60 - 64 W.T. TAYLOR 'CBOE'S AUTOMATION PLAN: KEEP THE FLOOR TUNED IN' | [X] - BANKING TECHNOLOGY vol. 6, no. 5, May 1989, UK page 45 M. RITSON 'The CME comes out Tops' | [XP] - WALL STREET COMPUTER REVIEW vol. 8, no. 6, March 1991, US pages 51 - 56 V. KULKOSKY 'Shrinking Technology Puts Power In Users' Hands' |