EP0452074 - Ergoline-8-carboxamides for blocking 5HT receptors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/42] | Improvements in and relating to ergoline-8-carboxamides | ||
[1996/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Marlene Lois 10532 Coppergate Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
Robertson, David Wayne 4290 Hunters Ridge Lane Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303088.8 | 09.04.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | US19900508324 | 11.04.1990 Original published format: US 508324 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0452074 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0452074 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452074 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D457/06, A61K31/48 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C07D457/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Ergolin-8-carboxamide zum Blockieren von 5HT-Rezeptoren | [1996/04] | English: | Ergoline-8-carboxamides for blocking 5HT receptors | [1996/04] | French: | Ergoline-8-carboxamides pour bloquer les récepteurs de la 5HT | [1996/04] |
Former [1991/42] | Verbesserungen bezüglich Ergolin-8-carboxamide | ||
Former [1991/42] | Improvements in and relating to ergoline-8-carboxamides | ||
Former [1991/42] | Améliorations concernant des ergoline-8-carboxamides | Examination procedure | 17.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2997470 (PIOCH RICHARD P); | [XD]EP0296748 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 33, no. 2, February 1990, WASHINGTON, US; pages 652 - 656; J.W.MISNER ET AL.: '(8BETA)-6-METHYLERGOLINE AMIDE DERIVATIVES AS SEROTONIN ANTAGONISTS: N1-SUBSTITUENT EFFECTS ON VASCULAR 5HT2 RECEPTOR ACTIVITY.' |