EP0455374 - Controlling a computer display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fossum, Gordon Clyde 12315-B Willow Wild Drive Austin, Texas 78758-2725 / US | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1991/45] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303356.9 | 16.04.1991 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | US19900516615 | 30.04.1990 Original published format: US 516615 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0455374 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0455374 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/72 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
G06T15/405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/45] | Title | German: | Rechneranzeigesteuerung | [1991/45] | English: | Controlling a computer display | [1991/45] | French: | Commande d'affichage de calculateur | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/49] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0167880 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0310176 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) | [A] - COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS. vol. 11, no. 1, 1987, OXFORD GB pages 11 - 19 RANKIN 'A GEOMETRIC HIDDEN-LINE PROCESSING ALGORITHM' |