EP0454444 - Glutarimide derivatives and herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satow, Jun, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Fukuda, Kenzou, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Itoh, Kaoru, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Kita, Hiroshi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Kawamura, Yasuo, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Koichi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 07 /
Nawamaki, Tsutomu, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 08 /
Watanabe, Shigeomi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 09 /
Endo, Toshiharu, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 1470, Oaza Shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1991/44] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303698.4 | 24.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | JP19900108236 | 24.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10823690 | JP19910089986 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8998691 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454444 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/88, C07D221/20, C07D265/36, C07D271/107, C07D273/02, C07D401/10, C07D413/04, C07D413/10, C07C233/15, C07C233/13, C07C233/43 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
A01N37/30 (EP);
A01N37/32 (EP);
A01N37/46 (EP);
A01N41/06 (EP);
A01N43/54 (EP);
A01N43/82 (EP);
A01N43/84 (EP);
C07C233/13 (EP);
C07C233/15 (EP);
C07C233/54 (EP);
C07C271/28 (EP);
C07C311/07 (EP);
C07D211/88 (EP);
C07D401/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Glutarimidderivate und Herbizide | [1991/44] | English: | Glutarimide derivatives and herbicides | [1991/44] | French: | Dérivés du glutarimide et herbicides | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 05.12.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1445652 ; | [X]GB768840 ; | [X]US2673205 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 11, March 16, 1987, Columbus, Ohio, USA KOMETANI T. et al. "A syn- thesis of succinimides and glutarimides from cyclic anhydrides" page 584, column 2abstract- no. 84 339k | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 55, no. 20, October 2, 1961, Columbus, OhioUSA NAKANO T. et al. "Structure of julocrotine" columns 19834,19835,abstract- no. 19 834c-19 835d | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 52, no. 1, January 10, 1958, Columbus, Ohio, USA MALLARD B.G. et al. "N-Allyl and N-aryl derivatives of 3-phenylglutarimides and 3-phenyl-2-methylglutarimides"column 317abstract-no. 317b | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 49, no. 13, july 10, 1955, Columbus, Ohio, USA MALLARD B.G. et al. "N-Allyl and N-aryl-3,3-diethylglutari-mides" column 8815abstract-no. 8 815 e | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 31, no. 1, January 10, 1937, Columbus, Ohio, USA PADEN j.H. et al. " Synthesis of pyrrolidines, piperidines and hexahydroazepines" column 683abstract-no. 683/2 |