EP0454493 - Reinsertable closure for sample tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macartney, Charles Terrence 83 Hollywood Crescent Toronto Ontario M4L 2K4 / CA | For all designated states Daykin, Victor Alexander 729 Pebble Court Pickering Ontario L1V 3Z5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states Macartney, Charles Terrence 83 Hollywood Crescent Toronto, Ontario M4L 2K4 / CA | ||
For all designated states Daykin, Victor Alexander 729 Pebble Court Pickering, Ontario L1V 3Z5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1991/44] | Application number, filing date | 91303816.2 | 26.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | CA19902015571 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: CA 2015571 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0454493 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0454493 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14, B65D51/00, B29C45/00, B29C45/16 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP);
B29C45/1676 (EP);
B65D41/28 (EP);
B29L2031/565 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/44] | B01L3/14, B65D51/00, B29C45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/44] | Title | German: | Einsteckbarer Stopfen für Probeflasche | [1991/44] | English: | Reinsertable closure for sample tubes | [1991/44] | French: | Bouchon amovible pour tubes à essais | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/10] | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0150172 ; | [X]FR2618683 ; | [A]WO8902399 ; | [A]GB2108943 ; | [X]EP0085360 ; | [A]FR2598137 ; | [A]FR2524379 |