EP0510274 - Light emitting diode printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haitz, Roland H. 25 Adair Lane Portola Valley, California 94028 / GB | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303844.4 | 25.04.1991 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510274 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/45, G06K15/12 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
B41J19/20 (EP);
B41J2/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/44] | Title | German: | Leuchtdiodendruckkopf | [1992/44] | English: | Light emitting diode printhead | [1992/44] | French: | Tête d'impression à diode électroluminescente | [1992/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 11.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59164161 ; | [A]JP63112172 ; | [A]US4820013 ; | [A]US4916464 ; | [A]US4605944 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 14 (M-352)(1737) 22 January 1985 & JP-A-59 164 161 ( OONISHI ) 17 September 1984, & JP59164161 A 19840917 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 356 (M-745)(3203) 26 September 1988 & JP-A-63 112 172 ( UEHARA ) 17 May 1988, & JP63112172 A 19880517 | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL vol. 10, no. 6, December 1985, pages 313 - 320; 'HIGH RESOLUTION, HIGH FREQUENCY INFRARED LED PRINTING ARRAY AND FABRICATION METHOD' |