EP0457459 - Minimising focus error in optical information storage systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | For all designated states BERNOULLI OPTICAL SYSTEMS COMPANY 5700 Flatiron Parkway Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | ||
For all designated states BERNOULLI OPTICAL SYSTEMS COMPANY 5700 Flatiron Parkway Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lopert, Robert Brian 5661 Gunbarrel Road Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | 02 /
Tzur, Israel 2795 Darley Avenue Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 03 /
Al Ponte, David 2065 Spencer Street Boulder, Colorado 80501 / US | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303926.9 | 01.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | US19900525895 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: US 525895 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457459 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457459 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/32, G11B7/00 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G11B23/0332 (EP);
G11B17/32 (EP);
G11B7/0908 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Fokussierfehlerminimierung in optischen Informationsspeichersystemen | [1991/47] | English: | Minimising focus error in optical information storage systems | [1991/47] | French: | Système de stockage d'information optique avec minimisation d'erreurs de focalisation | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/40] | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3926828 ; | [Y]EP0191567 ; | [A]DE2361650 |