EP0457465 - Integrated cracking, etherification and olefin upgrading process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax Virginia 22037-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harandi, Mohsen Nadimi 12 Catbird Court Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 02 /
Owen, Hartley 5 Riverview Terrace Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 54-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Curtis, Philip Anthony Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 54-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304000.2 | 02.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | US19900524948 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: US 524948 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457465 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457465 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/02 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
C07C41/06 (EP,US);
C10L1/023 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/06, C07C43/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Integriertes Verfahren zum Cracken, Etherifieren und Verbesserung von Olefinen | [1991/47] | English: | Integrated cracking, etherification and olefin upgrading process | [1991/47] | French: | Procédé intégré de craquage, d'éthérification et de valorisation d'oléfines | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0320180 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]GB2075017 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) |