EP0457491 - Gerotor pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCENTRIC PUMPS LIMITED Unit 10 Gravelly Industrial Park Tyburn Road Erdington Birmingham B24 8HW / GB | [1991/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeman, Richard Robert The Orchards, Ardens Grafton Alcester, Warwickshire / GB | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2 JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al GEORGE FUERY & CO Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304154.7 | 08.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | GB19900010686 | 12.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9010686 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457491 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457491 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/107 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
F04C2/102 (EP);
F04C2/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Gerotorpumpen | [1991/47] | English: | Gerotor pumps | [1991/47] | French: | Pompes du type gerotor | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53120843 ; | [A]US2397139 (HEATON HERMAN C); | [A]US2830542 (ERICKSON WILLIAM F, et al); | [Y]GB2022708 (BECK A J); | [A]GB2037372 (OS BAD ROZWOJOWY MECH); | [Y]EP0301158 (ATSUGI MOTOR PARTS CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 88 (M-17)(570) 24 June 1980, & JP-A-53 120843 (ANRETSUKTO K.K.) 31 March 1980,, & JP53120843 A 19800331 |