EP0461781 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/51] | Improvements in or relating to heat exchangers | ||
[1994/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERVOTOMIC LIMITED Coronation Road High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP12 3TA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states SERVOTOMIC LIMITED Coronation Road High Wycombe, Buckinghamshire HP12 3TA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellamy, Peter Nigel "Meadowside" 20 Plomer Green Lane Downley Bucks HP13 5TT / GB | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91304848.4 | 29.05.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | GB19900012080 | 31.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9012080 | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461781 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461781 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/16, F24H1/40, F24H8/00 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
F28F13/06 (EP);
F24H1/40 (EP);
F24H8/00 (EP);
F28F1/16 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [1991/51] | English: | Heat exchanger | [1994/13] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [1991/51] |
Former [1991/51] | Improvements in or relating to heat exchangers | Examination procedure | 04.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.1994 | CH | 30.03.1994 | DK | 30.03.1994 | LI | 30.03.1994 | SE | 30.03.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 30.03.1994 | |
CH | 30.03.1994 | ||
DK | 30.03.1994 | ||
LI | 30.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 30.03.1994 | |
CH | 30.03.1994 | ||
LI | 30.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 30.03.1994 | |
LI | 30.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5872888 ; | [A]US3205563 (PAULS THERON F, et al); | [A]US3540530 (KRITZER RICHARD W); | [A]EP0133039 (BRITISH ALCAN ALUMINIUM LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 169 (M-231)(1314) July 26, 1983 & JP-A-58 72 888 (ASAHI TEKKOSHO K.K. ) April 30, 1983, & JP5872888 A 00000000 |