EP0460974 - Power supply unit and welding equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sato, Ryoda 8-25, Ohamacho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states Sato, Ryoda 8-25, Ohamacho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 91305181.9 | 10.06.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | JP19900150585 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15058590 | JP19900150586 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15058690 | JP19900150587 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15058790 | JP19900150589 | 08.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15058990 | JP19900253179 | 19.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25317990 | JP19900253180 | 19.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25318090 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0460974 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0460974 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/10, B23K11/24, H02M5/14 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B23K11/241 (EP,US);
B23K9/1006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/50] | B23K11/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/50] | Title | German: | Energieversorgungseinheit und Schweissgerät | [1991/50] | English: | Power supply unit and welding equipment | [1991/50] | French: | Unité d'alimentation en énergie et appareil de soudage | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 08.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/12] | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3014352 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE); | [X]DE2855662 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH) |