EP0465015 - Digital comb filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohsaka, Yoshiaki, c/o Intellectural Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/47] |
Former [1992/02] | 01 /
Kohsaka, Yoshiaki, c/o intellectural Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305190.0 | 10.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900162715 | 22.06.1990 Original published format: JP 16271590 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465015 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465015 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/02, G11B15/473 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
G11B15/473 (EP,US);
H03H17/00 (KR);
H03H17/0251 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | G11B15/473, H04N5/782 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Digitaler Kammfilter | [1992/02] | English: | Digital comb filter | [1992/02] | French: | Filtre en peigne de type numérique | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0249465 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]DE3544865 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]DE3920164 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0326255 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]AT378642B (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |