EP0463802 - Method of preventing fabric encrustation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/01] | Composition and method of fabric encrustation prevention | ||
[1998/37] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland, California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kong, Stephen B. 3318 Washington Court Alameda, California 94501 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1992/01] | Froud, Clive ELKINGTON AND FIFE, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305580.2 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | US19900542493 | 22.06.1990 Original published format: US 542493 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463802 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463802 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/10, C11D3/28 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C11D3/28 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/2082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verhinderung der Gewebeinkrustation | [1998/37] | English: | Method of preventing fabric encrustation | [1998/37] | French: | Procédé pour prévention de l'incrustation sur le tissu | [1998/37] |
Former [1992/01] | Mittel zur Verhinderung der Gewebeinkrustation und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [1992/01] | Composition and method of fabric encrustation prevention | ||
Former [1992/01] | Composition pour prévention de l'incrustation sur le tissu et procédé | Examination procedure | 15.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.09.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1999
16.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House, Blackfriars/Weena 455 London EC4P 4BQ/3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Unilever Intellectual Property Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | 02
08.06.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Alexander, Sean Matthew N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1999
16.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC/ Unilever NV Unilever House, Blackfriars/ Weena 455 GB London EC4P 4BQ/ NL 3013 A1 Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
08.06.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Alexander, Sean Matthew N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
Former [2001/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1999
16.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC/ Unilever NV Unilever House, Blackfriars/ Weena 455 GB London EC4P 4BQ/ NL 3013 A1 Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
08.06.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
Former [1999/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1999
16.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC/ Unilever NV Unilever House, Blackfriars/ Weena 455 GB London EC4P 4BQ/ NL 3013 A1 Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
08.06.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Gault, Nathalie BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 19.07.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/27] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 04.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1998 | BE | 09.09.1998 | CH | 09.09.1998 | GR | 09.09.1998 | LI | 09.09.1998 | NL | 09.09.1998 | DK | 09.12.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 09.09.1998 | |
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 09.09.1998 | |
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 09.09.1998 | |
LI | 09.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2121568 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [X]DE2240309 (UNILEVER NV); | [X]DE2730951 (LION FAT OIL CO LTD); | [X]FR2396076 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [X]EP0094723 (BLAUWE LIER BV DE [NL]) |