EP0465112 - Tape cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Hiroshi, c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1992/02] | Application number, filing date | 91305795.6 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900171711 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: JP 17171190 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0465112 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0465112 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465112 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G11B23/08735 (EP,US);
G11B33/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Bandkassette | [1992/02] | English: | Tape cassette | [1992/02] | French: | Cassette à bande | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58200477 ; | [A]JP5860475 ; | [E]GB2243144 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4685016 (BARANSKI ANTONI S [US]); | [A]EP0045084 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al); | [A]GB2116520 (PHILIPS NV) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 51 (P-259)(1488) 8 March 1984 & JP-A-58 200 477 ( SONY K.K. ) 22 November 1983, & JP58200477 A 19831122 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 150 (P-207)(1295) 30 June 1983 & JP-A-58 60 475 ( SONY K.K. ) 9 April 1983, & JP5860475 A 19830409 | Examination | JPS60214488 |