EP0466379 - Apparatus for lifting and lowering seaming head in can end seaming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOKKAI CAN CO., LTD. No. 2-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states HOKKAI CAN CO., LTD. No. 2-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honma, Toru 2-1367, Nisshin-cho Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Izumi 1-54, Gamou-hon-cho Koshigaya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Kojika, Yoshiteru 22-125, Hikobei, Ohaza, Shiraoka-cho Minami-saitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Noboru 83-21, Miyauchi 2-chome Kitamoto-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305944.0 | 01.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | JP19900175558 | 02.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17555890 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0466379 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0466379 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466379 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/32, B30B1/18 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B21D51/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/03] | B21D51/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1992/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Heben und Sinken des Falzkopfes einer Dosendeckelfalzmaschine | [1992/03] | English: | Apparatus for lifting and lowering seaming head in can end seaming machine | [1992/03] | French: | Appareil pour lever et baisser la tête de sertissage dans une machine à sertir les couvercles de boîtes | [1992/03] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3030900 (MUNSCHAUER GEORGE E, et al); | [Y]FR1561963 ; | [Y]EP0302936 (ISHII MITOSHI) |