EP0471455 - Imaging apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PICKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states PICKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heuscher, Dominic J. 864 Circlewood Drive Aurora, Ohio / US | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | McGowan, Nigel George, et al Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | McGowan, Nigel George, et al The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1992/08] | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306591.8 | 19.07.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | US19900567300 | 14.08.1990 Original published format: US 567300 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471455 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471455 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471455 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0471455 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/5205 (EP,US);
G01T1/2985 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
A61B6/4266 (EP,US);
A61B6/541 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/08] | A61B6/03, G06F15/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1992/08] | Title | German: | Bildgerät und Verfahren | [1992/08] | English: | Imaging apparatus and methods | [1992/08] | French: | Appareil d'imagerie et méthodes | [1992/08] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/45: (deleted) | EPB 1997/45: (deleted) | EPB 1997/45: (deleted) | EPB 1996/03: Teilanmeldung 95117579.3 eingereicht am 08/11/95 | EPB 1996/03: Divisional application 95117579.3 filed on 08/11/95 | EPB 1996/03: Demande divisionnaire 95117579.3 déposée le 08/11/95 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95117579.3 / EP0713677 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Zentralabteilung Technik Abteilung ZT PA 4 Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [1998/40] | 17.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.05.2000 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.07.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.02.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4789929 (NISHIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0365301 (PICKER INT INC [US]); | [XP]EP0383232 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0426464 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | Opposition | US4293192 | EP0113879 |