EP0505637 - Process for the production of hollow profiles from multilayered starting materials, for example from webs, knitted fabrics, laid materials and belts. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/40] | Process for the production of hollow profiles from multilayered starting materials, for example from webs, knitted fabrics, laid materials and belts as well as hollow profiles so produced | ||
[1995/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINTERMANTEL, Erich Jahnallee 41 D-53173 Bonn / DE | [1992/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wintermantel, Erich Jahnallee 41 W-5300 Bonn 2 / DE | 02 /
Landwehr, Oswald Am Swistbach 1 W-5309 Meckenheim / DE | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/40] | Barker, Rosemary Anne MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306748.4 | 24.07.1991 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | DE19914109885 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109885 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505637 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505637 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D24/00, B29C55/24, B29C53/20 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
B29D99/001 (EP,US);
B29C53/20 (EP,US);
B29D24/001 (EP,US);
B29D99/0089 (EP,US);
Y10S264/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hohlprofilen aus mehrlagigen Vormaterialien, insbesondere aus Geweben, Gewirken, Gelegen und Bahnen. | [1995/36] | English: | Process for the production of hollow profiles from multilayered starting materials, for example from webs, knitted fabrics, laid materials and belts. | [1995/36] | French: | Procédé pour la production de profilés creux en matériaux multi-couches, par exemple, tissus, tricots, matériaux déposés et courroies. | [1995/36] |
Former [1992/40] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hohlprofilen aus mehrlagigen Vormaterialien, insbesondere aus Geweben, Gewirken, Gelegen und Bahnen sowie nach diesen Verfahren hergestellte Hohlprofile | ||
Former [1992/40] | Process for the production of hollow profiles from multilayered starting materials, for example from webs, knitted fabrics, laid materials and belts as well as hollow profiles so produced | ||
Former [1992/40] | Procédé pour la production des profilés vides des matériaux multi-couches, par exemple, tissus, tricots, matériaux déposés et courroies aussi que des produits fabriqués par sa mise en oeuvre | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.09.1995 | GR | 06.09.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 06.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1222848 ; | [A]DE1151369 (KOERTING RADIO WERKE GMBH); | [Y]US3201827 (REYNOLDS MAURICE V, et al); | [A]NL6507194 ; | [A]FR1480081 (KALLE AG); | [Y]US3378428 (BOGGS LE ROY R); | [A]US3897530 (LEATHERS JOEL M); | [A]GB1522432 (RUGGERI V); | [A]AT374304B (HUYCK FEZ GES M B H [AT]) |