EP0468776 - Improvements in or relating to article wrapping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PORTALS ENGINEERING LIMITED Laverstoke Mill Whitchurch Hampshire RC28 7NR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states PORTALS ENGINEERING LIMITED Laverstoke Mill Whitchurch, Hampshire RC28 7NR / GB | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states PORTALS ENGINEERING LIMITED Laverstoke Mill Whitchurch Hants. RG28 7NR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guthrie, Duncan Richard 72, Beechwood Avenue, Melborn Nr. Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 6BW / GB | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306763.3 | 24.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | GB19900016244 | 24.07.1990 Original published format: GB 9016244 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468776 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/54, B65B41/06 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B65B25/04 (EP);
B65B11/54 (EP);
B65B41/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/05] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen von oder in Bezug auf Vorrichtungen zum Verpacken von Gegenständen | [1992/05] | English: | Improvements in or relating to article wrapping apparatus | [1992/05] | French: | Améliorations dans ou en relation avec les appareils d'emballage d'objets | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/11] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3355166 ; | [A]EP0057144 ; | [A]US3662513 ; | [A]FR1435635 |