EP0524357 - Lithographic print and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axelrod, Herbert R. 6 Marine Place Deal New Jersey 07753 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states Axelrod, Herbert H. 6 Marine Place Deal, New Jersey 07753 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306887.0 | 26.07.1991 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524357 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03F3/04, G03F5/24, B41M1/18 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
G03F3/04 (EP,US);
B41M1/18 (EP,US);
G03F5/20 (EP,US);
G03F5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1993/04] | Title | German: | Lithographischer Druck und Verfahren | [1993/04] | English: | Lithographic print and method | [1993/04] | French: | Impression lithographique et procédé | [1993/04] | File destroyed: | 29.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2605181 (EDWARD ALEXANDER HAROLD, et al); | [A]US1742658 (ERICH LOENING); | [A]US2343685 (ROBERT MACKAY) |