EP0474363 - Wind propulsion system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states England, Kenneth John 6 Longridge Court, Barrington Industrial Estate Bedlington Northumberland NE22 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states England, Kenneth John 6 Longridge Court, Barrington Industrial Estate Bedlington, Northumberland NE22 7DQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307179.1 | 05.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | GB19900018562 | 23.08.1990 Original published format: GB 9018562 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474363 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/02 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
B63H9/02 (EP);
Y02T70/5236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | Windantriebssystem | [1992/11] | English: | Wind propulsion system | [1992/11] | French: | Système de propulsion sous l'effet du vent | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/42] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3246694 (KREBS ERICH DIPL ING); | [X]DE462869 (INST VOOR AERO EN HYDRO DYNAMI); | [Y]US2596726 (RYDELL JOSEF G A); | [XD]GB248447 (JOHN CORNWELL ROUND); | [A]US4342539 (POTTER JAMES A) |