EP0474365 - Filter cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | ||
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Andrew Derek 58 Hamble Drive Abingdon, Oxfordshire / GB | 02 /
Dawson, Ronald Keith 20 Upthorpe Drive Wantage, Oxfordshire / GB | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Mansfield, Peter Turquand, et al Patents Department, AEA Technology plc, 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Mansfield, Peter Turquand, et al United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Patents Department Building 329 Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire, OX11 0RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307215.3 | 06.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | GB19900019216 | 31.08.1990 Original published format: GB 9019216 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474365 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474365 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/02, B01D61/14, B01D35/06, C25F1/00 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
C25F1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/62 (EP,KR,US);
B01D35/06 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/425 (EP,KR,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1992/11] | Title | German: | Filterreinigung | [1992/11] | English: | Filter cleaning | [1992/11] | French: | Nettoyage de filtres | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0129447 (PALL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0149938 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [AD]GB2160545 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]EP0380266 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) |