EP0471521 - Surround sound matrix using a peak value detecting circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/08] | Peak value detecting circuit | ||
[1997/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katakura, Masayuki, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishihara, Masaaki, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Nicholls, Michael John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/08] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307353.2 | 09.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | JP19900214592 | 14.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21459290 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471521 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471521 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471521 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/04, H04S7/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
G01R19/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/08] | G01R19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/08] | Title | German: | Surround sound matrix mit Spitzenwert-Detektorschaltung | [1997/03] | English: | Surround sound matrix using a peak value detecting circuit | [1997/03] | French: | Matrice de son peripherique utilisant un circuit pour détecter les valeurs de crête | [1997/03] |
Former [1992/08] | Spritzenwert-Detektorschaltung | ||
Former [1992/08] | Peak value detecting circuit | ||
Former [1992/08] | Circuit pour détecter les valeurs de crête | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | DE3818455 | DE3640074 | - LINEAR DATABOOK, National Semiconductor 1980, page 3-47 |