EP0473326 - Water soluble derivatives of taxol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRGINIA TECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, INC. 1900 Kraft Drive Suite 107 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states VIRGINIA TECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, INC. 1900 Kraft Drive, Suite 107 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kingston, David G.I., Davidson Hall, Chem.Dep. Virginia Polytechnic Inst.State University Blacksburg, Virginia 24060-0212 / US | 02 /
Zhao, Zhi-Yang, Davidson Hall, Chem.Dep. Virginia Polytechnic Inst.State University Blacksburg, Virginia 24060-0212 / US | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [1992/10] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E. Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307460.5 | 13.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | US19900573731 | 28.08.1990 Original published format: US 573731 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473326 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/14, // A61K31/335 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
C07D305/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Derivate von Taxol | [1992/10] | English: | Water soluble derivatives of taxol | [1992/10] | French: | Dérivés solubles dans l'eau de taxol | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 17.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/17] | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0253739 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]); | [A]EP0336840 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | [A]EP0253738 |