EP0475598 - Method and apparatus for communicating monitor/management information between communication devices connected through a switched network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asahina, Takeshi 1405, Omaru Inagi-shi, Tokyo 206 / JP | 02 /
Mizutani, Yasunao 1405, Omaru Inagi-shi, Tokyo 206 / JP | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307527.1 | 14.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | JP19900218531 | 20.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21853190 | JP19900308371 | 14.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30837190 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0475598 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0475598 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475598 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
H04L41/0803 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/34 (EP);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übermittlung von Überwachungs-/ Verwaltungsinformation zwischen durch ein Vermittlungsnetz verbundenen Kommunikationseinrichtungen | [1998/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for communicating monitor/management information between communication devices connected through a switched network | [1992/12] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de communication d'information de surveillance/gestion entre des dispositifs de communication connectés par un réseau commuté | [1992/12] |
Former [1992/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übermittlung von Überwachungs-/Verwaltigungsinformation durch eine, mit dem Vermittlungsnetz verbundenen Kommunikationseinrichtung | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1997/21: Teilanmeldung 97200521.9 eingereicht am 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/21: Divisional application 97200521.9 filed on 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/21: Demande divisionnaire 97200521.9 déposée le 21/02/97 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97200521.9 / EP0788256 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4273955 (ARMSTRONG THOMAS R) | [A] - NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT no. 98, July 1990, TOKYO JP pages 72 - 79 T. ANZAI ET AL. 'Modem Systems for Corporate Information Networks' | [A] - SOUTHEASTCON '90 vol. 3, April 1990, NEW ORLEANS US pages 953 - 957 R. D. MARTIN 'Problem Management and Determination in SNA Sub-Networks' | [A] - ERICSSON REVIEW vol. 61, no. 1, 1984, STOCKHOLM SE pages 26 - 31 B. LENGQUIST ET AL. 'EDNET for the Supervision of Data Transmission Networks' |