EP0474401 - Power unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Stratford Road Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Stratford Road, Solihull Birmingham, West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | ||
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Brueton House, New Road Solihull, West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mason, Peter Cleve 35 Kirtley Way Broughton Astley, Leicester, LE9 6ND / GB | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Thompson, George Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1992/11] | Application number, filing date | 91307717.8 | 21.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | GB19900019400 | 05.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9019400 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0474401 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0474401 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474401 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/06, F16H61/02, B60K37/00 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H2059/743 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0015 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/04] | B60K41/06, F16H61/02 | ||
Former IPC [1992/11] | B60K41/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/11] | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit | [1992/11] | English: | Power unit | [1992/11] | French: | Unité de propulsion | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3900320 (WIELAND RAINER [DE]); | [A]WO8901421 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]US4899282 (HOLMES MICHAEL [GB]) | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS D. CONTROL THEORY & APPLICATIONS vol. 135, no. 5, September 1988, STEVENAGE GB pages 339 - 347 WESTBROOK 'Automotive transducers: an overview' |